Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/24/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Ranson
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
SCs named Stanley, Pemberton, Coleman, Garvin, Hamilton, Young
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/02/2024
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Echols
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Fugate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Swope
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Stark
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 2
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson, Townley, Baker, West (Tammy)
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
House
|
03/27/2024
|
Withdrawn from Public Health Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Public Health
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Stanley
|
|
|