Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1264 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 8, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 18, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024

Amended

Bill April 15, 2024
Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2024
Bill February 20, 2024