Senate | 04/29/2024 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Emergency removed | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) |