Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1287 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 6, 2024

Amended

Bill April 5, 2024
Bill February 22, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 4, 2024