Senate | 05/20/2024 | Approved by Governor 05/20/2024 | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
House | 05/15/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 05/15/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 3 | ||
Senate | 05/14/2024 | HAs adopted | ||
Senate | 04/24/2024 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 2 | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Amended | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | House Rule suspended | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/10/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to General Government | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/15/2024 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Rosino |