Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1296 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 12, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2024
Bill February 28, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 15, 2024

Amended

Bill April 10, 2024
Bill February 19, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 10, 2024