Senate | 04/26/2024 | Approved by Governor 04/26/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/22/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Deck | ||
House | 04/22/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/09/2024 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/14/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Jett | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Education | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Stanley |