Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1307 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 13, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 14, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 23, 2024

Amended

Bill April 9, 2024
Bill February 7, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 6, 2024