Senate
|
04/08/2024
|
Vetoed 04/08/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/02/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/01/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Williams
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Hamilton
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Hicks
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Alvord
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Rogers
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Jett
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Prieto
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator McCortney
|
|
|