Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1390 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 4, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 2, 2024

Amended

Bill March 26, 2024
Bill February 21, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 20, 2024