Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/23/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/18/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/18/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Stark
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/17/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 4
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Staires
|
|
|
House
|
04/17/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/02/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Transportation Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 5
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Aeronautics and Transportation committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Aeronautics and Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Miller (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Haste
|
|
|