Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1393 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2024

Amended

Bill April 15, 2024
Bill February 15, 2024