Senate
|
06/14/2024
|
Portions of Section 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2024
|
Line item vetoed 06/14/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
06/14/2024
|
Approved by Governor 06/14/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 6
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hefner
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Kirt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Munson
|
|
|
House
|
05/23/2024
|
Conference granted, naming Special Conference Committee on SB 1399
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
SCs named Hall, Garvin, Stewart, Pugh, Seifried, McCortney, Dossett
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 17
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Deck
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Wallace
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Remove as principal author Representative Wallace and substitute with Representative McBride
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/21/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Hall
|
|
|