Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1399 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 23, 2024
Bill March 12, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2024

Amended

Bill April 15, 2024
Bill February 22, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill May 28, 2024
Bill April 11, 2024
Bill February 8, 2024