House | 04/02/2024 | CR; Do Pass Agriculture Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/21/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 1 | ||
Senate | 02/20/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Coauthored by Senator Dossett | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Randleman | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Kerbs (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Pederson |