LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Oklahoma OK
Legislatures
2024 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB1422
Draft Versions
OK
Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1422
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session
Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1422
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
December 15, 2023
Compare
Engrossed
Bill
February 21, 2024
Compare
Amended
Bill
April 4, 2024
Compare
Bill
February 13, 2024
Compare
Comm Sub
Bill
February 12, 2024
Compare