Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
SCs named Thompson (Roger), Garvin, Stewart, Seifried, Hamilton, Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 2
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to General Government Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger)
|
|
|