Senate | 04/26/2024 | Approved by Governor 04/26/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/24/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/24/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/23/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 22 | ||
House | 04/23/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/02/2024 | CR; Do Pass Agriculture Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture | ||
Senate | 03/06/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/06/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 5 | ||
Senate | 03/05/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Coauthored by Representative West (Rick) (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Affairs committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Affairs | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Hamilton |