Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1442 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 15, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2024

Amended

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill February 13, 2024