Senate | 02/28/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/21/2024 | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Referred to Appropriations | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Reported Do Pass Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Thompson (Roger) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | First Reading |