Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1517 Compare Versions

OldNewDifferences
11
22
3-SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1517 SFLR Page 1
4-(Bold face denotes Committe e Amendments) 1
3+
4+Req. No. 2728 Page 1 1
5+2
6+3
7+4
8+5
9+6
10+7
11+8
12+9
13+10
14+11
15+12
16+13
17+14
18+15
19+16
20+17
21+18
22+19
23+20
24+21
25+22
26+23
27+24
28+ 1
529 2
630 3
731 4
832 5
933 6
1034 7
1135 8
1236 9
1337 10
1438 11
1539 12
1640 13
1741 14
1842 15
1943 16
2044 17
2145 18
2246 19
2347 20
2448 21
2549 22
2650 23
2751 24
2852
29-SENATE FLOOR VERSION
30-February 21, 2024
53+STATE OF OKLAHOMA
3154
55+2nd Session of the 59th Legislature (2024)
3256
33-SENATE BILL NO. 1517 By: Thompson (Roger)
57+SENATE BILL 1517 By: Thompson (Roger)
3458
3559
3660
3761
62+
63+AS INTRODUCED
3864
3965 An Act relating to the Oklahoma Historical Society;
4066 creating the Oklahoma Museum of Popular Culture
4167 Supplemental Revolving F und; stating source of funds;
4268 providing for expenditures; requiring certain
4369 determination by the State Treasurer; requiring
4470 transfer of funds if certain determination is not
4571 made by certain date; directing transfer of funds;
4672 providing for codification; and declaring an
4773 emergency.
48-
49-
5074
5175
5276
5377 BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF O KLAHOMA:
5478 SECTION 1. NEW LAW A new section of law to be codified
5579 in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 2294.1 of Title 62, unless there
5680 is created a duplica tion in numbering, reads a s follows:
5781 There is hereby created in the State Treasury a revolving fund
5882 for the Oklahoma Histori cal Society, to be designated the “Oklahoma
5983 Museum of Popular Culture Supplemental Revolving Fund”. The fund
6084 shall be a continuing fund, not subject to fisca l year limitations,
6185 and shall consist of all monies r eceived by the Oklahoma Historical
6286 Society from appropriations of the Legislature design ated for
6387 deposit in this fund. All monies accruing to the credit of the fund
6488 are hereby appropriated and shall be budgeted and expended to
6589
66-SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1517 SFLR Page 2
67-(Bold face denotes Committe e Amendments) 1
90+
91+Req. No. 2728 Page 2 1
92+2
93+3
94+4
95+5
96+6
97+7
98+8
99+9
100+10
101+11
102+12
103+13
104+14
105+15
106+16
107+17
108+18
109+19
110+20
111+21
112+22
113+23
114+24
115+ 1
68116 2
69117 3
70118 4
71119 5
72120 6
73121 7
74122 8
75123 9
76124 10
77125 11
78126 12
79127 13
80128 14
81129 15
82130 16
83131 17
84132 18
85133 19
86134 20
87135 21
88136 22
89137 23
90138 24
91139
92140 provide funding for repairs, plann ing, staging, refurbishments, and
93141 improvements to real and personal property, and funding for
94142 construction of the Oklahoma Museum of Popular Culture. No
95143 expenditures shall be made from the fund until the State Treasurer
96144 determines that funds provided by local and county governments, the
97145 federal government, or through monetary donations in the amount of
98146 Eighteen Million Dollars ($18,000,000.00) are made for repairs,
99147 planning, staging, refurbishm ents, and improvements to real and
100148 personal property, and funding for construction of the Okla homa
101149 Museum of Popular Culture ; provided, no funds collected or received
102150 prior to May 25, 2023, shall be counted toward the amount.
103151 Expenditures from the fund shall be made upon warrants issued by th e
104152 State Treasurer against claims filed as prescribed by law with the
105153 Director of the Office of Management and Enterprise S ervices for
106154 approval and payment. On November 15, 2025, if no determination is
107155 made by the State Treasurer pursuant to the provisions of this
108156 section authorizing expenditures from this fund, all unencumbered
109157 funds remaining in the Oklahoma Museum of Popular Cultur e
110158 Supplemental Revolving Fund shall be transferred to the State
111159 Treasurer for deposit in the Gener al Revenue Fund of the State
112160 Treasury for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024.
113161 SECTION 2. The Director of the Office of Management and
114162 Enterprise Services shall transfer on the effective date of this act
115163 the sum of Eighteen Million Dollars ($18,000,000.00) of the funds
116164
117-SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1517 SFLR Page 3
118-(Bold face denotes Committe e Amendments) 1
165+
166+Req. No. 2728 Page 3 1
167+2
168+3
169+4
170+5
171+6
172+7
173+8
174+9
175+10
176+11
177+12
178+13
179+14
180+15
181+16
182+17
183+18
184+19
185+20
186+21
187+22
188+23
189+24
190+ 1
119191 2
120192 3
121193 4
122194 5
123195 6
124196 7
125197 8
126198 9
127199 10
128200 11
129201 12
130202 13
131203 14
132204 15
133205 16
134206 17
135207 18
136208 19
137209 20
138210 21
139211 22
140212 23
141213 24
142214
143215 appropriated to the Oklahoma Historical Society pursuant to Section
144216 106 of Enrolled House Bill No. 1004 of the 1st Extraordinary Session
145217 of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature to the Oklahoma Museum of Popular
146218 Culture Supplemental Revolving Fund created in Section 1 of this
147219 act.
148220 SECTION 3. It being immediately necessary for the preservatio n
149221 of the public peace, health or sa fety, an emergency is hereby
150222 declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and
151223 be in full force from and after its pass age and approval.
152-COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS
153-February 21, 2024 - DO PASS
224+
225+59-2-2728 JC 12/21/2023 3:49:08 PM