Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1517 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 02/22/2024

                             
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1517 SFLR 	Page 1 
(Bold face denotes Committe e Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
SENATE FLOOR VERSION 
February 21, 2024 
 
 
SENATE BILL NO. 1517 	By: Thompson (Roger) 
 
 
 
 
 
An Act relating to the Oklahoma Historical Society; 
creating the Oklahoma Museum of Popular Culture 
Supplemental Revolving F und; stating source of funds; 
providing for expenditures; requiring certain 
determination by the State Treasurer; requiring 
transfer of funds if certain determination is not 
made by certain date; directing transfer of funds; 
providing for codification; and declaring an 
emergency. 
 
 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     NEW LAW     A new section of law to be codified 
in the Oklahoma Statutes as Section 2294.1 of Title 62, unless there 
is created a duplication in numbering, reads a s follows: 
There is hereby created in the State Treasury a revolving fund 
for the Oklahoma Histori cal Society, to be designated the “Oklahoma 
Museum of Popular Culture Supplemental Revolving Fund”.  The fund 
shall be a continuing fund, not subject to fisca l year limitations, 
and shall consist of all monies receive d by the Oklahoma Historical 
Society from appropriations of the Legislature design ated for 
deposit in this fund. All monies accruing to the credit of the fund 
are hereby appropriated and shall be budgeted and expended to   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1517 SFLR 	Page 2 
(Bold face denotes Committe e Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
provide funding for repairs, plann ing, staging, refurbishments, and 
improvements to real and personal property, and funding for 
construction of the Oklahoma Museum of Popular Culture. No 
expenditures shall be made from the fund until the State Treasurer 
determines that funds provided by local and county governments, the 
federal government, or through monetary donations in the amount of 
Eighteen Million Dollars ($18,000,000.00) are made for repairs, 
planning, staging, refurbishm ents, and improvements to real and 
personal property, and funding for construction of the Okla homa 
Museum of Popular Culture ; provided, no funds collected or received 
prior to May 25, 2023, shall be counted toward the amount. 
Expenditures from the fund shall be made upon warrants issued by the 
State Treasurer against claims filed as prescribed by law with the 
Director of the Office of Management and Enterprise S ervices for 
approval and payment.  On November 15, 2025, if no determination is 
made by the State Treasurer pursuant to th e provisions of this 
section authorizing expenditures from this fund, all unencumbered 
funds remaining in the Oklahoma Museum of Popular Cultur e 
Supplemental Revolving Fund shall be transferred to the State 
Treasurer for deposit in the General Revenue Fund of the State 
Treasury for the fiscal year ending June 30, 2024. 
SECTION 2. The Director of the Office of Management and 
Enterprise Services shall transfer on the effective date of this act 
the sum of Eighteen Million Dollars ($18,000,000. 00) of the funds   
 
SENATE FLOOR VERSION - SB1517 SFLR 	Page 3 
(Bold face denotes Committe e Amendments)  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
appropriated to the Oklahoma Historical Society pursuant to Section 
106 of Enrolled House Bill No. 1004 of the 1st Extraordinary Session 
of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature to the Oklahoma Museum of Popular 
Culture Supplemental Revolving Fund created in Section 1 of this 
act. 
SECTION 3.  It being immediately necessary for the preservatio n 
of the public peace, health or sa fety, an emergency is hereby 
declared to exist, by reason whereof this act shall take effect and 
be in full force from and after its pass age and approval. 
COMMITTEE REPORT BY: COMMITTEE ON APPROPRIATIONS 
February 21, 2024 - DO PASS