Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Emergency removed
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
SCs named Pemberton, Jett, Dugger, Garvin, Matthews
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Moore
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 8
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Davis
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hilbert
|
|
|
House
|
04/15/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/05/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 3
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Hays (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Pemberton
|
|
|