Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1520 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 27, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 5, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill May 22, 2024
Bill April 15, 2024

Amended

Bill April 15, 2024
Bill February 7, 2024