Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1520 Latest Draft

Bill / Comm Sub Version Filed 05/22/2024

                            RBS No. 3788 
 
Req. No. 3788 	Page 1  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
STATE OF OKLAHOMA 
 
2nd Session of the 59th Legislature (2024) 
 
CONFERENCE COMMITTEE SUBSTITUTE 
FOR ENGROSSED 
SENATE BILL 1520 	By: Pemberton and Stephens of 
the Senate 
 
  and 
 
  Hays, Hilbert, Davis, and 
Moore of the House 
 
 
 
CONFERENCE COMMITTEE SUBSTITUT E 
 
An Act relating to Teachers’ Retirement System of 
Oklahoma; amending 70 O.S. 2021, Section 17 -116.10, 
as amended by Section 9 of Enrolled House Bill No. 
2528 of the 2nd Session of the 59th Oklahoma 
Legislature, which relates to postretireme nt 
employment; providing for increased earnings 
limitations for certain retired members through 
certain date; updating statutory l anguage; and 
removing obsolete language . 
 
 
 
BE IT ENACTED BY THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF OKLAHOMA: 
SECTION 1.     AMENDATORY     70 O.S. 2021, Section 17 -116.10, 
as amended by Section 9 of Enrolled House Bill No. 2528 of the 2nd 
Session of the 59th Oklahoma Legislature, is amended to read as 
follows: 
Section 17-116.10.  A.  Subject to the requirements of Sect ion 
6-101.2 of this title and any other applicable requirements of law, 
a member may enter into postretirement employment with a public  RBS No. 3788 
 
Req. No. 3788 	Page 2  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
school of Oklahoma and still receive monthly retirement benefits 
subject to the following limitations: 
1.  A retired member is not eligible to be employed by the 
public schools of Oklahoma, in any capacity, for sixty (60) calendar 
days between the retiree’s last day of preretirement public 
education employment and any postretirement public education 
employment.  For purpose s of this section, the term “last day of 
preretirement employment” shall mean the last day the employee is 
required to be physically present on the job to complete the terms 
of the employment contract or agreement or the member’s effective 
retirement date, whichever is later.  An employee on paid leave is 
still considered to be employed for purposes of this section.  
Employment under any conditions during this time, volunteer services 
for the purpose of obtaining a paid position at a later date, or 
payment at a later time for services performed during this time 
period shall cause the forfeiture of all retirement benefits 
received during the period; 
2.  For thirty-six (36) months following a member’s effective 
retirement date, the retired member shall be subj ect to earnings 
limitations on allowable earnings.  Earnings limits are determined 
annually based on a calendar year.  For retired members under the 
age of sixty-two (62) years of age, allowed earnings from the public 
schools of Oklahoma for employment for the performance of duties 
ordinarily performed by classified or nonclassified optional  RBS No. 3788 
 
Req. No. 3788 	Page 3  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
personnel shall be limited to one -half (1/2) of the member’s final 
average salary used in computing retirement benefits or the earnings 
limit allowed by the Social Secu rity Administration for those under 
Social Security’s normal retirement age, whichever is less.  For 
retired members sixty -two (62) years of age or older, allowed 
earnings from the public schools of Oklahoma for the performance of 
duties ordinarily perform ed by classified or nonclassified personnel 
shall be limited to Thirty Thousand Dollars ($30,000.00) or one -half 
(1/2) of the member’s final average salary used in computing 
retirement benefits, whichever is less.  Notwithstanding the 
earnings limits provi ded in this paragraph, for a period beginning 
on the effective date of this act and ending December 31, 2027, a 
retired member who ha s fulfilled the sixty-day break in employment 
provided in paragraph 1 of this subsection and who return s or has 
previously returned to work as an active classroom teacher in common 
education or career tech school districts shall be subject to annual 
earnings limitations of Fifty Thousand Dollars ($50,000.00) on 
allowable earnings for the member’s reemployment period.  For 
purposes of this paragraph, the following shall apply: 
a. earnings shall mean regular annual compensation as 
defined in paragraph 23 of Section 17-101 of this 
title, and shall include any payment by a public 
school for services rendered by a retired member who 
is employed for any purpose whatsoever.  Supplemental  RBS No. 3788 
 
Req. No. 3788 	Page 4  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
retirement payments paid by a former public school 
employer pursuant to subsection N of Section 17-105 of 
this title or other state law shall not be considered 
as earnings, 
b. the earnings limit for th e calendar year in which a 
member retires shall be one -twelfth (1/12) of the 
annual limit multiplied by the number of months the 
member is eligible to work and receive payments from 
the public schools of Oklahoma, and 
c. earnings in excess of the maximum l imit on allowed 
earnings from public schools of Oklahoma shall result 
in a loss of retirement benefits of One Dollar ($1.00) 
for each One Dollar ($1.00) earned over the maximum 
allowed earnings amount; and 
3.  Notwithstanding paragraph 2 of this subsection , for a period 
of three (3) years beginning July 1, 2017, members who have retired 
as of July 1, 2017, as active classroom teachers, who have been 
retired and receiving a benefit for at least one (1) year, and who 
have not been employed by any public schoo l during that one-year 
period, shall be eligible to be reemployed as an active classroom 
teacher in common or career tech scho ol districts, with no 
limitations on earnings.  For a period of three (3) years beginning 
July 1, 2021, members who have retired a s of July 1, 2020, who have 
been retired and receiving a benefit for at least one (1) year, and  RBS No. 3788 
 
Req. No. 3788 	Page 5  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
who have not been employed by any public school during that one -year 
period, shall be eligible to be reemployed as an active classroom 
teacher in common or care er tech school districts, with no 
limitations on earnings.  The one -year period starts with the 
retiree’s last day of preretir ement public education employment.  
Members returning under this section shall not be subject to any 
earnings limitations followin g the end of the three -year periods 
described in this paragraph.  Members returning under this section 
shall only be employed pursuant to a temporary contract; and 
4. A member shall be considered to be employed by a school 
district to perform the duties o rdinarily performed by classified or 
nonclassified optional personnel if the member is hired by the 
school district in the mem ber’s individual capacity to perform the 
duties or if the member performs the duties through employment with 
a proprietorship, par tnership, corporation, limited liability 
company or partnership, or any other business structure that has 
agreed or contracted to provide the services to the school district. 
B.  A public school district that employs a retired member shall 
be required to make contributions to the System for the retired 
member in an amount as required in Section 17 -108.1 and in paragraph 
3 of subsection B of Section 17-116.2 of this title. 
C.  For purposes of this section, postretirement employment of 
less than one thousand (1,000) hours per year with the Governor, the 
Oklahoma State Senate, the Oklahoma House of Representatives or the  RBS No. 3788 
 
Req. No. 3788 	Page 6  1 
2 
3 
4 
5 
6 
7 
8 
9 
10 
11 
12 
13 
14 
15 
16 
17 
18 
19 
20 
21 
22 
23 
24 
  
Legislative Service Bureau shall not be considered as postretirement 
employment with a public school of Oklahoma. 
D.  The Board of Trustees of the Teachers’ Retirement System of 
Oklahoma shall promulgate such rules as are necessary to implement 
the provisions of this section. 
E.  A member who has entered into postretirement employment with 
a participating employer of the Teachers’ Retirement Sys tem of 
Oklahoma must fully comply with all the provisions of the rules 
promulgated by the Board of Trustees pursuant to this section in 
order to continue receiving the member’s monthly retirement benefit. 
 
59-2-3788 RD 5/22/2024 11:13:08 AM