Senate | 04/24/2024 | Approved by Governor 04/23/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/18/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/18/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/17/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1 | ||
House | 04/17/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | CR; Do Pass Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Criminal Justice and Corrections | ||
Senate | 02/28/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/28/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/27/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Ford (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Weaver |