Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1528 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 28, 2023

Engrossed

Bill February 28, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 18, 2024

Amended

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill February 7, 2024