Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1534 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 2, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 25, 2024
Bill February 21, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill May 28, 2024
Bill April 10, 2024

Amended

Bill April 10, 2024
Bill February 7, 2024