Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1543 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 3, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 24, 2024

Amended

Bill March 28, 2024
Bill February 21, 2024