Senate | 05/28/2024 | Approved by Governor 05/28/2024 | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
House | 05/23/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 05/23/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 25 Nays: 11 | ||
Senate | 05/22/2024 | HAs adopted | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | HAs read | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 6 | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/24/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | Title restored | ||
House | 04/03/2024 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce | ||
Senate | 03/18/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/18/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Measure passed: Ayes: 27 Nays: 12 | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | Title stricken | ||
Senate | 03/14/2024 | General Order, Amended | ||
Senate | 02/19/2024 | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/14/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Sims (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Daniels |