Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1572 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 5, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 23, 2024

Amended

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill February 20, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 3, 2024