Senate
|
06/14/2024
|
Approved by Governor 06/14/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/30/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
To Senate
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
05/30/2024
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
House
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
SCs named Coleman, Thompson (Kristen), Paxton, Deevers, Gollihare, Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 1
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/18/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/18/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 9
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Emergency added
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/27/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/19/2024
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Coleman
|
|
|