Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1635 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 12, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 30, 2024

Amended

Bill April 15, 2024
Bill February 20, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill April 11, 2024