Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/22/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on States Powers
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/07/2024
|
SCs named Daniels, Rosino, Haste, Gollihare, Stanley, Young
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2024
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Williams
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 17
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Hill
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator(s) Pederson, Bullard
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/04/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, State Powers Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to State Powers
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative CrosswhiteHader (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/29/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Daniels
|
|
|