Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1677 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2024
Bill March 13, 2024

Amended

Bill April 4, 2024
Bill March 4, 2024