House | 03/29/2023 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | ||
Senate | 03/14/2023 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 03/14/2023 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 03/13/2023 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 03/08/2023 | Coauthored by Representative Burns (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/23/2023 | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Coauthored by Senator Bullard | ||
Senate | 02/07/2023 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | ||
Senate | 02/06/2023 | Authored by Senator Gollihare |