Senate
|
05/23/2024
|
Approved by Governor 05/23/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
05/21/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/21/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Stephens
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
HAs adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/20/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative May
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Townley
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/29/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/29/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 30
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Burns, Ford
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/25/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/09/2024
|
CR; Do Pass Rules Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/06/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/06/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
General Order, Amended
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Pederson
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/14/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/08/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Rosino
|
|
|