Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1709 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 16, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 29, 2024
Bill March 6, 2024

Enrolled

Bill May 21, 2024

Amended

Bill April 9, 2024
Bill February 15, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 8, 2024