House
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR submitted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 29 Nays: 13
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/29/2024
|
CCR adopted
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
Title restored
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/28/2024
|
CCR read
|
|
|
House
|
05/16/2024
|
Conference granted, naming GCCA
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/30/2024
|
SCs named Dossett, Pemberton, Jett, Coleman, Garvin, Woods, Matthews
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/25/2024
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/24/2024
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/24/2024
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 26
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Amended by floor substitute
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson, Ranson, Deck
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
04/01/2024
|
Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/26/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/11/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/11/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 30 Nays: 11
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/07/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/05/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Roe (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Dossett
|
|
|