Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1742 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2024

Engrossed

Bill April 24, 2024
Bill March 11, 2024

Amended

Bill April 15, 2024
Bill February 29, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 13, 2024