Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1819 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 17, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 18, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 22, 2024

Amended

Bill April 3, 2024
Bill February 20, 2024