Senate
|
04/26/2024
|
Approved by Governor 04/26/2024
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Sent to Governor
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/23/2024
|
Enrolled, to House
|
|
|
House
|
04/23/2024
|
Signed, returned to Senate
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/22/2024
|
Referred for enrollment
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Amendment restores bill to engrossed version
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Enacting clause restored
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative(s) Munson, Swope, Deck
|
|
|
House
|
04/22/2024
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/11/2024
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/25/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/13/2024
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/13/2024
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2024
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2024
|
Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Senator Bullard
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Coauthored by Representative Wallace (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Referred to Appropriations
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/13/2024
|
Reported Do Pass as amended Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2024
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/05/2024
|
Authored by Senator Floyd
|
|
|