Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB1933 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill March 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 23, 2024

Amended

Bill April 15, 2024
Bill February 29, 2024

Comm Sub

Bill February 28, 2024