Senate | 05/01/2024 | Approved by Governor 05/01/2024 | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | Sent to Governor | ||
Senate | 04/29/2024 | Enrolled, to House | ||
House | 04/29/2024 | Signed, returned to Senate | ||
Senate | 04/25/2024 | Referred for enrollment | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 0 | ||
House | 04/25/2024 | General Order | ||
House | 04/11/2024 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | ||
House | 04/04/2024 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/26/2024 | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/25/2024 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | ||
Senate | 02/13/2024 | Engrossed to House | ||
House | 02/13/2024 | First Reading | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Referred for engrossment | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | ||
Senate | 02/12/2024 | General Order, Considered | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Coauthored by Representative Pfeiffer (principal House author) | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Reported Do Pass Finance committee; CR filed | ||
Senate | 02/06/2024 | Second Reading referred to Finance | ||
Senate | 02/05/2024 | Authored by Senator Rader |