Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB2023 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 18, 2024

Engrossed

Bill February 13, 2024

Enrolled

Bill April 29, 2024

Amended

Bill April 15, 2024
Bill February 6, 2024