Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB249 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2023

Engrossed

Bill March 1, 2023

Enrolled

Bill April 20, 2023

Amended

Bill April 5, 2023
Bill February 13, 2023