House
|
05/16/2024
|
Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/09/2024
|
SCs named Howard, Gollihare, Thompson (Kristen), Rader, Jech, Floyd
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/06/2024
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
Conferees unable to agree
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/25/2023
|
CCR read
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/11/2023
|
SCs named Howard, Gollihare, Daniels, McCortney, Boren
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/01/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
05/01/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 3
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
House Rule suspended
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Enacting clause stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/10/2023
|
CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary - Civil Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
02/23/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 8
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/22/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/15/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Kannady (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Judiciary
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Howard
|
|
|