Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB261 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2023

Engrossed

Bill May 1, 2023
Bill February 23, 2023

Amended

Bill April 10, 2023
Bill February 8, 2023