Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
SCs named Garvin, Coleman, Jech, Stewart, Standridge, Weaver, Kirt
|
|
|
Senate
|
05/19/2023
|
HAs rejected, conference requested
|
|
|
Senate
|
04/27/2023
|
HAs read
|
|
|
House
|
04/27/2023
|
Engrossed, signed, to Senate
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 79 Nays: 8
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Title stricken
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Amended
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
General Order
|
|
|
House
|
04/26/2023
|
Referred for engrossment
|
|
|
House
|
04/12/2023
|
CR; Do Pass Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances Committee
|
|
|
House
|
03/29/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco and Controlled Substances
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/20/2023
|
Engrossed to House
|
|
|
House
|
03/20/2023
|
First Reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/14/2023
|
General Order, Considered
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/23/2023
|
Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author)
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/20/2023
|
Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/07/2023
|
Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/06/2023
|
Authored by Senator Garvin
|
|
|