Oklahoma 2024 Regular Session

Oklahoma Senate Bill SB263 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill January 10, 2023

Engrossed

Bill April 27, 2023
Bill March 20, 2023

Amended

Bill April 12, 2023
Bill February 21, 2023